Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1878 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 3, 2022
Fiscal Note May 4, 2022
Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note March 8, 2022
Fiscal Note February 8, 2022
Bill December 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 18, 2022
Bill April 20, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis December 30, 2021

Substitute

Bill May 3, 2022