Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 9, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Referred: Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/15/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|