Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1986 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Fiscal Note February 3, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Bill December 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Bill February 1, 2022
Analysis January 4, 2022