LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1995
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB1995
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB1995
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 10, 2022
Bill
December 16, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 23, 2022
Bill
February 16, 2022
Compare
Analysis
January 4, 2022