House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred: Utilities(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/21/2021 | Prefiled (H) |