LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2052
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2052
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2052
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 23, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 25, 2022
Bill
December 21, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 24, 2022
Bill
March 23, 2022
Compare
Analysis
January 6, 2022