House
|
07/01/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 104 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Adopts (H) - SCS, as amended AYES: 103 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 13
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Laid Over (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS, as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 and SA 3, adopted. AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2 and SA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 25, 2022, 3:30 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Workforce Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|