Senate | 04/21/2022 | Second read and referred: Education(S) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 18 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Prefiled (H) |