Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Fiscal Note April 1, 2022
Fiscal Note March 15, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 30, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022