House | 04/13/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |