Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022