House | 04/26/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred: Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |