Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022