House | 03/21/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |