Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2704 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 11, 2022
Fiscal Note March 7, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022