Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 97 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/08/2021 | Prefiled (H) |