Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HJR94 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 8, 2022
Fiscal Note January 3, 2022
Bill December 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis December 30, 2021