House
|
07/01/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
H recedes in HCS, as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
S requests H recede & take up and pass bill
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Motion to dissolve conference S adopted (Hegeman)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Hegeman, Crawford, Eslinger, Roberts, May
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Falkner, Taylor (139), Pietzman, Merideth, Adams
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HSA 1 for HA 14 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4303H05.71H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Chipman)--(4303H05.73H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HSA 1 for HA 14 to HCS H offered (Taylor-139)--(4303H05.71H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 14 to HCS H offered (Porter)--(4303H05.32H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(4303H05.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-16)--(4303H05.22H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(4303H05.18H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 10 to HCS H adopted--(4303H05.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Perkins)--(4303H05.70H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 10 to HCS H offered (Billington)--(4303H05.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4303H05.29H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 2 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4303H05.67H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Coleman-97)--(4303H05.64H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered (Fishel)--(4303H05.29H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4303H05.31H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hicks)--(4303H05.54H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered (Davidson)--(4303H05.31H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4303H05.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 5 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (McCreery)--(4303H05.57H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 4 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (Murphy)--(4303H05.56H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 3 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Merideth)--(4303H05.39H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 2 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-137)--(4303H05.53H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Taylor-139)--(4303H05.48H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered (Falkner)--(4303H05.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pietzman)--(4303H05.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4303H05.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(4303H05.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered (Sander)--(4303H05.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Basye)--(4303H05.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hudson)--(4303H05.34H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(4303H05.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Falkner)--(4303H05.24H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Committee Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Motion to Do Pass Failed H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred H Special Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(4303S03.06S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(4303S03.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Eslinger)--(4303S03.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(4303S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4303S.02C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|