Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB724 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note March 8, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Bill December 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022