House
|
05/13/2022
|
H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4164S04.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(4164S04.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SS S offered (Eigel)--(4164S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|