Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 9, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Bill December 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2022