House
|
05/13/2022
|
H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Perfected, as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SA 3 S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(4622S02.06S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SA 2 S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(4622S02.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
SA 1 S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(4622S02.04S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|