Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 9, 2022
Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note March 6, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2022