House | 05/08/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |