Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 and SS SCS, pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 11, 2023, 3:00, Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|