House
|
05/12/2023
|
H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred H Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Koenig)--(0139S03.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
SS S offered (Mosley)--(0139S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|