House
|
05/12/2023
|
In Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS--(1229S.08S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
H Conferees allowed to exceed the differences on sections 29.005, 29.225, 29.235 & 610.021 H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
S Conferees allowed to exceed the differences on sections 29.005, 29.225, 29.235 & 610.021 S adopted (Trent)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Trent, Luetkemeyer, Coleman, Beck, McCreery
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House conferees appointed: C. Brown, Parker, Riley, Proudie, Bangert
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(1229H03.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 17 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (West)--(1229H03.48H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 17 to HCS H offered (Murphy)--(1229H03.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 16 to HCS H withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 16 to HCS H offered (Windham)--(1229H03.65H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 16 to HCS H offered (Cook)--(1229H03.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 15 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sander)--(1229H03.51H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 15 to HCS H offered (Boyd)--(1229H03.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Farnan)--(1229H03.08H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 13 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Falkner)--(1229H03.40H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 13 to HCS H offered (Reedy)--(1229H03.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lovasco)--(1229H03.06H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Perkins)--(1229H03.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 10 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.03H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & defeated (Windham)--(1229H03.47H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wilson)--(1229H03.52H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Taylor)--(1229H03.60H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 10 to HCS H offered (Baker)--(1229H03.03H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinman)----(1229H03.61H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bangert)--(1229H03.42H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schwadron)--(1229H03.46H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered (McGaugh)--(1229H03.27H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 3 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & defeated (Merideth)--(1229H03.59H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 2 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sharpe-4)--(1229H03.41H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schwadron)--(1229H03.53H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered (Haffner)--(1229H03.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(1229H03.24H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christ)--(1229H03.50H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered (Christofanelli)--(1229H03.24H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(1229H03.23H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Keathley)--(1229H03.28H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christ)--(1229H03.02H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(1229H03.26H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hudson)--(1229H03.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (C. Brown)--(1229H03.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Washington)--(1229S02.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SS S offered (Trent)--(1229S.02F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|