House
|
05/12/2023
|
In Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS--(0902S.05S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Gannon, Crawford, Brown (16), Razer, McCreery
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Riley, Perkins, Hicks, Lavender, Bland Manlove
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference (Gannon)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Boyd)--(0902H03.14H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(0902H03.12H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sassmann)--(0902H03.10H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bromley)--(0902H03.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (O'Donnell)--(0902H03.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Boggs)--(0902H03.30H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered (Baker)--(0902H03.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0902H03.03H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Riley)--(0902H03.22H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0902H03.02H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Referred H Special Committee on Tax Reform
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|