House
|
04/25/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Laid Over (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 22 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|