House
|
05/07/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 121 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 124 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
SS Adopted (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Perfected (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|