Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Message (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 25, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 8
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|