Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 12, 2024
Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024