House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|