Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note March 7, 2024
Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024