House
|
05/17/2024
|
S Bills with H Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5262H06.13H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HSA 1 for HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haffner)--(5262H06.15H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered (Falkner)--(5262H06.07H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Re-Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rural Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rural Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Rural Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred H Rural Community Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Reconsider Third Reading Vote (Brown (26)) - S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Defeated on Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(5262S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (5262S.03C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|