Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri Senate Bill SB1351 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 8, 2024
Fiscal Note April 3, 2024
Fiscal Note March 8, 2024
Fiscal Note February 21, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024