House
|
05/17/2024
|
S Bills with H Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3439H05.01H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Corrections and Public Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Corrections and Public Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred H Corrections and Public Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed - EC Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Roberts)--(3439S03.04S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
SS S offered (Black)--(3439S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Hearing Cancelled S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|