House
|
05/17/2024
|
Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
H refuses to recede & requests S take up and pass bill
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference (Coleman)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, S withdrawn (Coleman)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Substitute Motion to refuse to concur and request House recede or grant conference and the conferees be allowed to exceed the differences (Rizzo)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Motion to concur in HCS, as amended (Coleman)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Motion to concur in HCS, as amended S offered & withdrawn (Coleman)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Riley)--(3890H17.02H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Hearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred H Elections and Elected Officials
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#4 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 2 to SS#4 for SCS S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(3890S13.06S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SS#4 for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#4 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S13.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#4 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S13.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SS#4 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S13.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#4 for SCS S offered (Coleman)--(3890S.13F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#3 for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#3 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S12.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#3 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S12.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SS#3 for SCS S offered (Roberts)--(3890S12.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#3 for SCS S offered (Coleman)--(3890S.12F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#2 for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Arthur)--(3890S09.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Arthur)--(3890S09.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Arthur)--(3890S09.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS#2 for SCS S offered (Coleman)--(3890S.09F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SA 1 to SSA 2 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Beck)--(3890S07.18S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SSA 2 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Beck)--(3890S07.16S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Beck)--(3890S07.13S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Beck)--(3890S07.12S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Beck)--(3890S07.05S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
SS for SCS S offered (Coleman)--(3890S.07F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 74, 48, 59, 61 & 83) Local Government and Elections Committee (3890S.04C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled
|
|
|