Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 27, 2025
Bill January 9, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 19, 2025

Chaptered

Bill April 8, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 7, 2025
Analysis February 7, 2025
Analysis January 21, 2025