Legislature | 04/14/2025 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | President/Speaker signed | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | ||
Legislature | 04/10/2025 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | ||
Legislature | 04/03/2025 | Placed on Final Reading | ||
Legislature | 03/28/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | ||
Legislature | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Select File | ||
Legislature | 03/12/2025 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | ||
Legislature | 02/18/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Legislature | 01/21/2025 | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2025 | ||
Legislature | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | ||
Legislature | 01/10/2025 | Date of introduction |