Nebraska 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB84 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 29, 2025
Bill January 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 3, 2025

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 13, 2025
Analysis January 17, 2025