Senate | 04/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Bush |