Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 20, 2022
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021