Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Ranson |