Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |