House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens, Jett
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Steagall, Lepak, Bashore, Hill, Humphrey, West (Tammy), Kendrix, Osburn, Grego, Dempsey, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Bennett
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Mize
|
|
|