Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2021