House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Withdrawn from General Government committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|