Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 10, 2021