House
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Technology
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|